Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11480951 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2022026889 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP79624 | 30.10.2019 | EP18211722 | 11.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113168167B | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | B | CN113168167 | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP79624 | 30.10.2019 | EP18211722 | 11.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3847517 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2022 | B1 | EP3847517 | 14.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP79624 | 30.10.2019 | EP18211722 | 11.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020119999 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18211722 | 11.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3667445 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18211722 | 11.12.2018 |