EP3880589 - LINEAR SORTER HAVING VARIABLY RUNNING CROSS-BELT SUPPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körber Supply Chain Logistics GmbH Lilienthalstraße 16/18 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2021/38] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASCHPURWIS, Carsten Mainaustr. 212 78464 Konstanz / DE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19801775.8 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP79959 | Priority number, date | EP20180206077 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18206077 | [2021/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020099149 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880589 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/71, B65G54/02, B65G47/96 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
B65G54/02 (EP,US);
B65G47/71 (EP,US);
B65G47/96 (EP,US);
B65G2203/0291 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | LINEARSORTIERER MIT VARIABEL LAUFENDEN QUERGURT-TRÄGERN | [2021/38] | English: | LINEAR SORTER HAVING VARIABLY RUNNING CROSS-BELT SUPPORTS | [2021/38] | French: | TRIEUR LINÉAIRE AVEC DES ÉLÉMENTS PORTEURS À BANDE TRANSVERSALE À DÉFILEMENT VARIABLE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9627544 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1216938 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE102010027925 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014195392 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102014117150 (BECKHOFF AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2016297619 (HAHN WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 3,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP3176111 (BEUMER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 2,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *; | [YD]WO2017092763 (BEUMER GROUP AS [DK]) [YD] 1-8 * abstract * * page 7 - page 8 * * figures 1-3,6-7 * | by applicant | US9409716 | WO2016206695 | WO2017092763 | WO2017108048 | US9809388 | US2018170690 |