Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11369991 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2022 | B2 | US2021121914 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018099211 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019JP19977 | 20.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2019225559 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2020 | A1 | JP6625301B | 25.12.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018099211 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019JP19977 | 20.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112135694B | Global Dossier | 16.06.2023 | B | CN112135694 | 25.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018099211 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019JP19977 | 20.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3100452 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | C | CA3100452 | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018099211 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019JP19977 | 20.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3797878 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A4 | EP3797878 | 31.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018099211 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019JP19977 | 20.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019225559 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018099211 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI793326B | 21.02.2023 | B | TW202003714 | 16.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018099211 | 23.05.2018 |