EP3797878 - METHOD FOR FORMING MULTILAYER COATING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kansai Paint Co., Ltd 33-1, Kanzaki-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-8555 / JP | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMURA, Masahiro c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD., 1, Hirachi, Azabu-cho Miyoshi-shi, Aichi 470-0206 / JP | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19808001.2 | 20.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019JP19977 | Priority number, date | JP20180099211 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018099211 | [2021/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019225559 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797878 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/36, B05D5/06, B05D7/14, B05D7/24 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
B05D7/577 (EP,US);
B05D7/5723 (US);
B05D5/06 (US);
B05D7/14 (EP);
B05D7/142 (US);
B05D2202/10 (EP,US);
B05D2252/00 (US);
B05D2350/60 (US);
B05D2401/20 (US);
B05D2420/05 (US);
B05D2451/00 (EP);
B05D2601/24 (US);
B05D7/572 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B05D2451/00, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSBILDUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSFILMS | [2021/13] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING MULTILAYER COATING FILM | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FILM DE REVÊTEMENT MULTICOUCHE | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2020 | Translation filed | 20.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 19.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]GB2295974 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,7 * page 12 - page 14; examples 3 (A-5 & B2); table 2 * * claims 1, 9, 14 * [I] 2,5,6,8; | [D]JPH08164358 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2016200922 (SUGAMOTO KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0120]; claim 2; table 1 * | International search | [A]JP2004351391 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-8* , entire text *; | [A]WO2011125490 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2012125747 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2012157827 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016221473 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017154089 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text *; | [A]WO2018034278 (AS PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , entire text * | by applicant | JPH08164358 |