EP3757874 - ACTION RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAO, Yu No. 1068, Xueyuan Avenue Shenzhen University Town Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Lei No. 1068, Xueyuan Avenue Shenzhen University Town Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Yali No. 1068, Xueyuan Avenue Shenzhen University Town Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Lihui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Jianzhuang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19810779.9 | 28.05.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019CN88694 | Priority number, date | CN201810533284 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810533284 | [2021/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019228316 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757874 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3757874 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/40, G06V10/62, G06V10/74 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G06V40/20 (EP,US);
G06F18/21 (US);
G06F18/22 (EP,US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06V10/40 (EP,US);
G06V10/62 (EP,US);
G06V10/72 (US);
G06V10/761 (EP,US);
G06V10/7715 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/14] | G06K9/00, G06K9/62, G06T7/20 | ||
Former IPC [2021/01] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AKTIONSERKENNUNG | [2021/01] | English: | ACTION RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE D'ACTION | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2020 | Translation filed | 23.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MARJANEH SAFAEI ET AL, "Single Image Action Recognition by Predicting Space-Time Saliency", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170512), XP080947664 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN103164694 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]CN105303571 (UNIV SOOCHOW) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [Y]CN107967441 (UNIV BEIJING TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 2-122 *; | [Y] - QIAO, QINGWEI, "Human . Action Recognition via Dual Spatio-Temporal Network Flow and Attention Mechanism Fusion", Master's Theses , (201810), vol. 40, no. 10, pages 2395 - 2401, XP055734724 [Y] 1-18 * , abstract * |