EP3888208 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GROUND FAULT DETECTION IN POWER SYSTEMS USING COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins Power Generation IP, Inc. 1400 73rd Avenue, NE Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMA, Shubhranshu 3850 Victoria Street Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | 02 /
DELAGO, Julie M. 15049 Afton Hills Dr. Afton, Minnesota 55001 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19818500.1 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US63267 | Priority number, date | US201816202571 | 28.11.2018 Original published format: US201816202571 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112785 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888208 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/04, H02H3/32, H02H7/26 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
H02H7/263 (EP);
G01R31/086 (US);
G01R31/088 (US);
H02H1/0007 (US);
H02H3/042 (EP);
H02H3/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERDFEHLERDETEKTION IN STROMSYSTEMEN MIT EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2021/40] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GROUND FAULT DETECTION IN POWER SYSTEMS USING COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2021/40] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISANT UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION POUR DÉTECTER UN DÉFAUT À LA TERRE DANS DES SYSTÈMES D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 24.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CA2186988 (EATON CORP [US]); | [XI]US2010008000 (RILEY DONVILLE ANDRE [US], et al); | [XI]US9837812 (VALDES MARCELO ESTEBAN [US], et al) |