EP3822289 - ANTI-SIRP ALPHA ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Kobe University 1-1 Rokkodai-cho Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657-8501 / JP | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATOZAKI Takashi c/o National University Corporation Kobe University, 1-1, Rokkodai-cho, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657-8501 / JP | 02 /
SUE Mayumi c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY, LIMITED, 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA Kensuke c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY, LIMITED, 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIMURA Chigusa c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY, LIMITED, 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Arends, William Gerrit Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19833586.1 | 09.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019JP27114 | Priority number, date | JP20180131116 | 10.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018131116 | [2021/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013170 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822289 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P43/00, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N15/13, C12N15/63, C12P21/08 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP);
C07K16/2896 (CN,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN);
A61P43/00 (EP,CN);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,CN);
C07K16/2863 (US);
C07K16/2887 (US);
C07K2317/21 (CN,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/33 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/34 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/52 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/565 (CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/71 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/72 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | ANTI-SIRP-ALPHA-ANTIKÖRPER | [2021/20] | English: | ANTI-SIRP ALPHA ANTIBODY | [2021/20] | French: | ANTIBODY ANTI-SIRP ALPHA | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2021 | Translation filed | 10.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2017068164 (OSE IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS [FR]); | [I]WO2018008470 (UNIV KOBE NAT UNIV CORP [JP]); | [ID]WO2018026600 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al); | [I]WO2018057669 (ALEXO THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [I]WO2018107058 (ALECTOR LLC [US]); | International search | [XYA]JP2014525940 ; | [Y]US2015337053 (MCCARTHY STEPHEN [US], et al); | [YA]JP2016169220 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2017510251 ; | [XYA]WO2017178653 (OSE IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS [FR]); | by applicant | WO8807089 | US4946778 | US5091513 | US5260203 | WO9428027 | WO9429351 | US5455030 | WO2004061104 | WO2014094122 | US2015183874 | WO2017178653 | WO2018026600 | JP2018131116 | WO2018190719 |