EP3899701 - HIGH-PRECISION TEMPORAL MEASUREMENT OF VIBRO-ACOUSTIC EVENTS IN SYNCHRONISATION WITH A SOUND SIGNAL ON A TOUCH-SCREEN DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTPELLIER 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | For all designated states Naturalpad 70 Ancien Chemin de Saint-Vincent 34730 Prades-Le-Lez / FR | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALLA BELLA, Simone 5335 Avenue Doherty Montréal, Québec H4V 2B5 / CA | 02 /
ANDARY, Sébastien Domaine mas du Rouquet 34980 SAINT-GELY DU FESC / FR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19836807.8 | 23.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP86899 | Priority number, date | FR20180073999 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873999 | [2021/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128088 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899701 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3899701 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, A61B5/16, A61B5/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP);
A61B5/123 (US);
A61B5/162 (EP);
A61B5/6898 (EP);
A61B5/748 (US);
G10L25/51 (US);
H04R1/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGENAUE ZEITLICHE MESSUNG VON VIBROAKUSTISCHEN EREIGNISSEN IN DER SYNCHRONISATION MIT EINEM SCHALLSIGNAL AUF EINER BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG | [2021/43] | English: | HIGH-PRECISION TEMPORAL MEASUREMENT OF VIBRO-ACOUSTIC EVENTS IN SYNCHRONISATION WITH A SOUND SIGNAL ON A TOUCH-SCREEN DEVICE | [2021/43] | French: | MESURE TEMPORELLE A HAUTE PRECISION D'EVENEMENTS VIBRO-ACOUSTIQUES EN SYNCHRONISATION AVEC UN SIGNAL SONORE SUR DISPOSITIF A ECRAN TACTILE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 12.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 10.01.2024 | |
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 10.04.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005122898 (PLUG IN MEDICAL [DK], et al); | [IDA]US2014249447 (SERENO ANNE BIBIANA [US], et al); | [A]US2016110021 (VICE JACK M [US], et al); | [XP]EP3454339 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) | by applicant | US2014249447 | EP2875419 |