Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.06.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.03.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 | Change - classification | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 | Change - classification | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
24.09.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.07.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.04.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
23.04.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
05.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.12.2020 | Change - representative | |
09.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |