Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024132954 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | US201916515790 | 18.07.2019 | US202318400702 | 29.12.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11884976 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2024 | B2 | US2020024661 | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | US201916515790 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210034551 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7408587B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2024 | B2 | JP2021530575 | 11.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL279472 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2024 | B1 | IL279472 | 31.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112673029 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3103448 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019305036 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3823997 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2022 | A4 | EP3823997 | 26.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020026299 | 05.03.2024 | B1 | BR112020026299 | 30.03.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020014067 | 27.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202012638T | 28.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | WO2019US42415 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020018798 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI822818B | 21.11.2023 | B | TW202012506 | 01.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862701228 | 20.07.2018 |