EP3823997 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND FLOW CELLS INCORPORATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERKEL, Timothy J. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
GEORGE, Wayne N. 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB21 6DF / GB | 03 /
BROWN, Andrew A. 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB21 6DF / GB | 04 /
ZAK, Audrey 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 05 /
ARTIOLI, Gianluca Andrea 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB21 6DF / GB | 06 /
MORRISON, Julia 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB21 6DF / GB | 07 /
ROMANOV, Nikolai 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB21 6DF / GB | 08 /
BERTI, Lorenzo 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 09 /
BOUD, Graham 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19837153.6 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019US42415 | Priority number, date | US201862701228P | 20.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862701228 P | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020018798 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823997 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/06, C08F2/48, C08L33/04, C08L63/00, C08G77/20, G03F7/004, G03F7/029, G01N15/14, G01N33/49 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
C08G77/20 (EP,IL,KR);
C08F2/48 (IL,KR);
C12Q1/6874 (IL,US);
C08F230/08 (EP,IL);
C08F299/08 (EP,IL);
C08G77/442 (IL,US);
C08K5/53 (EP,IL);
C08L33/04 (IL,KR,US);
C08L63/00 (IL,KR,US);
C08L83/04 (IL,KR);
C08L83/06 (IL);
C09D153/00 (IL,US);
C09D163/00 (IL,US);
C09D183/06 (EP,IL);
C12Q1/6876 (IL,US);
G01N15/14 (IL,KR);
G01N33/4915 (IL,KR);
G03F7/0002 (EP,IL);
G03F7/0045 (IL,KR);
G03F7/027 (EP,IL);
G03F7/029 (EP,IL,KR);
G03F7/031 (EP,IL);
G03F7/038 (EP,IL);
G03F7/0755 (EP,IL);
G03F7/0757 (EP,IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/53, C08L83/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | C08F2/48, C08L83/04, C08L33/04, C08L63/00, C08G77/20, G03F7/004, G03F7/029, G01N15/14, G01N33/49 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DURCHFLUSSZELLEN DAMIT | [2021/21] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION AND FLOW CELLS INCORPORATING THE SAME | [2021/21] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET CELLULES À FLUX INCORPORANT CELLE-CI | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2016137839 (ROLLAND JASON P [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017007753 (ILLUMINA INC [US]); | [X]WO2017187030 (BLUESTAR SILICONES FRANCE [FR]); | International search | [Y]US2005260522 (WEBER WILLIAM [US], et al); | [Y]US2010141211 (YAZAMI RACHID [US]); | [A]US2016025637 (HALVERSON KURT J [US], et al); | [XY]US2016137839 (ROLLAND JASON P [US], et al); |