EP3858688 - ELECTRIC BRAKE, AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA, Wataru c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd., 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Daisuke c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd., 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19864155.7 | 12.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019JP35822 | Priority number, date | JP20180180345 | 26.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018180345 | [2021/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020066645 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858688 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3858688 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17, B60T13/74, F16D65/18, F16D121/24 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
B60T13/741 (EP);
B60T8/17 (US);
B60T13/662 (EP);
B60T13/746 (US);
B60T17/221 (US);
F16D55/226 (EP,US);
F16D65/18 (US);
F16D65/183 (EP);
F16D65/38 (EP);
F16D66/00 (EP,US);
B60T2201/12 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0029 (EP,US);
F16D2065/386 (EP,US);
F16D2066/003 (EP,US);
F16D2066/005 (EP);
F16D2121/24 (EP,US);
F16D2125/40 (EP,US);
F16D2125/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE BREMSE UND STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/31] | English: | ELECTRIC BRAKE, AND CONTROL DEVICE | [2021/31] | French: | FREIN ÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2021 | Translation filed | 16.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 21.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011240418 (TACHIIRI YOSHIKAZU [JP]); | [A]US2015308530 (SHIN DONG HWAN [KR], et al); | [XAI]US2016214595 (BAEHRLE-MILLER FRANK [DE], et al) | International search | [A]JP2011063170 (ADVICS CO LTD); | [A]WO2016104680 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2018180345 |