Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
23.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.02.2024 | First examination report | |
22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.11.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.01.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
21.01.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
26.11.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.01.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 | Change - classification | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 | Change - classification | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
06.11.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.09.2020 | Change - representative | |
01.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.05.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.05.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |