EP3747890 - CROSSLINKING AGENT COMPOSITION, LIQUID CRYSTAL ALIGNMENT AGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME, METHOD FOR PREPARING LIQUID CRYSTAL ALIGNMENT FILM BY USING SAME, AND LIQUID CRYSTAL ALIGNMENT FILM AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE WHICH USE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOO, Kichul LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seongku LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Minju LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19886270.8 | 11.11.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019KR15279 | Priority number, date | KR20180143861 | 20.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180143861 | [2020/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020105927 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747890 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C09K19/56, C08G73/10, C08L79/08, C09D179/08, G02F1/1337 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
C08G73/1078 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/06 (US);
C07D413/14 (US);
C07F7/0816 (US);
C07F7/188 (KR);
C08G73/10 (KR);
C08G73/1067 (EP);
C08L79/08 (EP,KR);
C09D179/08 (KR,US);
C09D5/00 (US);
G02F1/133711 (EP,US);
G02F1/133723 (KR);
G02F1/133788 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L79/08, C08L79/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | VERNETZUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLAUSRICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKRISTALLAUSRICHTUNGSSCHICHT UNTER VERWENDUNG DAVON UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLAUSRICHTUNGSSCHICHT UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/50] | English: | CROSSLINKING AGENT COMPOSITION, LIQUID CRYSTAL ALIGNMENT AGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME, METHOD FOR PREPARING LIQUID CRYSTAL ALIGNMENT FILM BY USING SAME, AND LIQUID CRYSTAL ALIGNMENT FILM AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE WHICH USE SAME | [2020/50] | French: | COMPOSITION D'AGENT DE RÉTICULATION, COMPOSITION D'AGENT D'ALIGNEMENT DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES COMPRENANT CELLE-CI, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE COUCHE D'ALIGNEMENT DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES L'UTILISANT, COUCHE D'ALIGNEMENT DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES L'UTILISANT | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2020 | Translation filed | 01.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 30.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1448897 (TOYO RAYON CO LTD) [X] 1,6 * compound with RN:19389-96-9; page 2, column r, line 1 - line 20 *; | [A]US2016009860 (FEVRE MAREVA B [US], et al) [A] 1-14* claims 1,20-24 *; | [X]CN107434772 (SHANGHAI ZAIQI BIO TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6 * page 5; example 3 *; | [A]WO2017222281 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * page 20; example DA3 * * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2012177061 (DONGJIN SEMICHEM CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-14; | [A]US2016009860 (FEVRE MAREVA B [US], et al) [A] 1-14; | [A]CN107434772 (SHANGHAI ZAIQI BIO TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-14; | [A]KR20170143365 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14; | [A] - SHELUDYAKOV, V. D., "Synthesis of Carbofunctional Organosilicon Compounds. New Silicon-Containing Heterocycles", Chemischer Informationsdienst, (19810000), XP055710717 [A] 1-14 * , Abstract 268 * |