Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020112638 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020112637 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020047490 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020047488 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2020 | A8 | WO2020047488 | 05.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024164488 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | US201916696522 | 26.11.2019 | US202418425737 | 29.01.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024156204 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201916557096 | 30.08.2019 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | US202318196748 | 12.05.2023 | US202318538426 | 13.12.2023 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024148101 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418412220 | 12.01.2024 | US202217981619 | 07.11.2022 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | US201916557289 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024081468 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | US201916694306 | 25.11.2019 | US202318514057 | 20.11.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023276894 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916557096 | 30.08.2019 | US202318196748 | 12.05.2023 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023030904 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | US202217967064 | 17.10.2022 | US201916694327 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11903449 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | B2 | US2023058535 | 23.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217981619 | 07.11.2022 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | US201916557289 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11882904 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2024 | B2 | US2020170352 | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | US201916696522 | 26.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11819087 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | B2 | US2020170331 | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | US201916694306 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11684110 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | B2 | US2020068981 | 05.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916557096 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11490676 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2022 | B2 | US2020068983 | 05.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | US201916557289 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11470910 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2022 | B2 | US2020170351 | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | US201916694327 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11083425 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2021 | B2 | US2019192094 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816021828 | 28.06.2018 | US201715853296 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10610174 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201816021828 | 28.06.2018 | US201715853296 | 22.12.2017 | US201916577289 | 20.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10034642 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201715853296 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240046811 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | KR20237001267 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240039227 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | KR20237011666 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210087061 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63009 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210087060 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US63352 | 26.11.2019 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102705664B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2024 | B1 | KR20220154852 | 22.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | KR20217017060 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102656033B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2024 | B1 | KR20230014849 | 30.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | KR20227007618 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102649951B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | B1 | KR20230048575 | 11.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | KR20227008581 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102520056B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2023 | B1 | KR20220038533 | 28.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | KR20217009455 | 30.08.2019 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102489210B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2023 | B1 | KR20220038502 | 28.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | KR20217016459 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102467400B | Global Dossier | 14.11.2022 | B1 | KR20210068633 | 09.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | KR20207031066 | 30.08.2019 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102376818B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2022 | B1 | KR20210038714 | 07.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102373735B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2022 | B1 | KR20210068146 | 08.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102263036B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2021 | B1 | KR20200125759 | 04.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024105335 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2022092880 | 08.06.2022 | JP2021510902 | 30.08.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024028963 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021531054 | 25.11.2019 | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63009 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023030017 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | JP2021531013 | 25.11.2019 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7404366B | Global Dossier | 25.12.2023 | B2 | JP2022511460 | 31.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63009 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7516374B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2024 | B2 | JP2022510955 | 28.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US63352 | 26.11.2019 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7196305B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2022 | B2 | JP2022508290 | 19.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7480224B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2024 | B2 | JP2022133288 | 13.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021510902 | 30.08.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022101527 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | JP2020552359 | 30.08.2019 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7087191B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2022 | B2 | JP2021527544 | 14.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7027568B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B2 | JP2021510602 | 30.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4403064 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US63352 | 26.11.2019 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | EP19888419 | 26.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4307553 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | A3 | EP4307553 | 17.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | EP19889528 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4302626 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | A3 | EP4302626 | 10.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | EP19888492 | 25.11.2019 | WO2019US63009 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4212056 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | EP19855487 | 30.08.2019 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4176752 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | EP19854504 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3886639 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | B1 | EP3886639 | 10.08.2022 | A4 | EP3886639 | 06.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63009 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3886630 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | B1 | EP3886630 | 10.08.2022 | A4 | EP3886630 | 06.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3843577 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2023 | B1 | EP3843577 | 07.07.2021 | A4 | EP3843577 | 07.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3703524 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2022 | B1 | EP3703524 | 10.03.2021 | A4 | EP3703524 | 09.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115444191 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | CN201980067248 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114631667 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | CN201980079211 | 25.11.2019 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114145532 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | CN201980010668 | 30.08.2019 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113163903B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2024 | B | CN113163903 | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63009 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113163890B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2022 | B | CN113163890 | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US63012 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113163889 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US63352 | 26.11.2019 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112888333B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2022 | B | CN112888333 | 01.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111836562B | Global Dossier | 03.12.2021 | B | CN111836562 | 27.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862773842 | 30.11.2018 | US201862773867 | 30.11.2018 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3886629 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2024 | B1 | EP3886629 | 10.08.2022 | A4 | EP3886629 | 06.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US63352 | 26.11.2019 | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN211532910U | 22.09.2020 | U | Priority number | Date | US201916557096 | 30.08.2019 | WO2019US49179 | 30.08.2019 | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | WO2019US49184 | 30.08.2019 | US201916577289 | 20.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202019104811U | 23.12.2019 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201962855635 | 31.05.2019 | US201862725733 | 31.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020112841 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862773379 | 30.11.2018 | Type | Divisional application | EP4403064 |