EP3886629 - AUTOLACING FOOTWEAR HAVING A SLIDING SECURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVAR, Eric P. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Summer L. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/40] | 01 /
AVAR, Eric P. C/O NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | ||
02 /
SCHNEIDER, Summer L. C/O NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/40] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19888419.9 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US63352 | Priority number, date | US201862773379P | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862773379 P | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112841 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886629 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3886629 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/00, A43C1/04, A43C7/00, A43C19/00, A43B3/40, A43B11/00, A43C11/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A43C11/165 (EP,KR,US);
A43B11/00 (EP,KR);
A43B13/125 (EP);
A43B3/06 (EP);
A43B3/34 (EP,KR,US);
A43B3/40 (EP);
A43C1/00 (EP,US);
A43C1/04 (KR);
A43C11/004 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | A43B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHNÜRENDES SCHUHWERK MIT EINER GLEITFIXIERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/40] | English: | AUTOLACING FOOTWEAR HAVING A SLIDING SECURING DEVICE | [2021/40] | French: | CHAUSSURE À AUTO-LAÇAGE COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION COULISSANT | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24167968.7 / EP4403064 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]KR100807105B (KANG BYUNG DO [KR]) | International search | [A]US5327662 (HALLENBECK BARRY [US]); | [Y]KR100807105B (KANG BYUNG DO [KR]); | [A]US2008307673 (JOHNSON GREGORY G [US]); | [A]KR20110106772 (JEONG MAN HO [KR]); | [Y]US2017265579 (SCHNEIDER SUMMER L [US], et al) | by applicant | KR100807105B |