EP3890486 - C3-C5 N-ALKYL-GAMMA-BUTYROLACTAM-CONTAINING ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virox Technologies Inc. 2770 Coventry Road Oakville, Ontario L6H 6R1 / CA | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDERSON, Faraz A. 2770 Coventry Road Oakville, Ontario L6H 6R1 / CA | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19892728.7 | 04.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019CA51740 | Priority number, date | US201862774964P | 04.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862774964 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020113331 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3890486 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/36, A01P1/00, A61L2/16 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
A01P1/00 (EP);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N25/30 (US);
A61L2/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | C3-C5 N-ALKYL-GAMMA-BUTYROLACTAM-ENTHALTENDE ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/41] | English: | C3-C5 N-ALKYL-GAMMA-BUTYROLACTAM-CONTAINING ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2021/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ANTIMICROBIENNES CONTENANT N-ALKYL-GAMMA-BUTYROLACTAME EN C3-C5 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1169113 (BASF AG [DE]); | [I]US5035859 (GU BEN [US], et al); | [I]WO2008052031 (ALCON MFG LTD [US], et al); | [X]WO2013107822 (TAMINCO [BE]); | International search | [XY]GB1525120 (NELSON RES & DEV) [X] 5, 11, 12, 14-16, 18 and 20-22 [Y] 5-16 and 18-22; | [XY]US4132781 (STOUGHTON RICHARD B) [X] 5, 11, 12, 14-16, 18 and 20-22 [Y] 5-16 and 18-22; | [A]US4305749 (MILDENBERGER HILMAR, et al) [A] 17-22; | [X]CA2007239 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 17-22; | [X]WO03094920 (TIBOTEC PHARM LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-18, 20 and 21; | [A]US2004192933 (MANZER LEO ERNEST [US], et al) [A] 17-22; | [X]WO2006005551 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 17-22; | [X]JP2007031299 (TAISHO TECHNOS CO LTD) [X] 18-22; | [A]US2008095863 (KABRA BHAGWATI P [US]) [A] 1-22; | [X] - DHAVAN, A.A., "Antibacterial and Antifungal Activities of2,3-Pyrrolidinedione Derivatives Against Oral Pathogens", Bioorganic and Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20160204), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2016.01.082, pages 1376 - 1380, XP029418008 [X] 17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2016.01.082 | [X] - ZENG, X.H., "Antifungal activities of (E)-4-Benzylidene-5-oxopyrrolidine- 2- carboxamides and 6-Oxo-1,2,3, 6-tetrahydropyridin-2-carboxamides Synthezed via Ugi Reaction from Baylis-Hillman Bromides", 2nd International Conference on Agricultural and Biological Sciences (ABS 2016): IOP Conference Series: Earth and Environmental Science, (20160000), vol. 41, pages 1 - 5, XP055717227 [X] 17 and 19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1755-1315/41/1/012017 | [A] - HOSSEINZADEHA, Z. et al., "An Overview on Chemistry and Biological Importance of Pyrrolidinone", Current Organic Synthesis, (20180301), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 166 - 178, XP055717228 [A] 1-22 * ; in particular: Section 4 and Figure 36 (page 172-174) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1570179414666170908165445 | by applicant | GB1525120 | US4132781 | US2015057375 |