Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020148888 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP01461 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11802695 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2023 | B2 | US2022049857 | 17.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP01461 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7031019B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2022 | B2 | JPWO2020148888 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP01461 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3913290 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | B1 | EP3913290 | 26.01.2022 | A4 | EP3913290 | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP01461 | 18.01.2019 |