Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4002670
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.08.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.05.2024 |
First examination report |
|
01.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.06.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
16.12.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
23.09.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] |
23.09.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] |
02.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
22.04.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
29.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.12.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
13.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|