Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021009831 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP27869 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7191227B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2022 | B2 | JPWO2021009831 | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP27869 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114008907B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2024 | B | CN114008907 | 01.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP27869 | 16.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4002670 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2023 | A4 | EP4002670 | 25.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP27869 | 16.07.2019 |