EP4002670 - POWER CONVERSION DEVICE AND DETERIORATION DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO., LTD. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobon Mendez Mauricio de Jesus c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 19937456.2 | 16.07.2019 | [2022/21] | WO2019JP27869 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009831 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002670 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02M7/06, H02M7/5387, H02M7/5395 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H02M7/5387 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
H02M7/06 (EP);
H02M7/5395 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | H02M7/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR DIAGNOSE VON VERSCHLECHTERUNG | [2022/21] | English: | POWER CONVERSION DEVICE AND DETERIORATION DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | [2022/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE ET SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC DE DÉTÉRIORATION | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2021 | Translation filed | 16.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH11346476 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * * claims 1,2,4 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]JP2007240450 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0038] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 5-7,9-11; | [A]US2018175775 (YOSHIDA TOMOKAZU [JP]) [A] 5,6,9* paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0014] , [0051] - [0055]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2008172910 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-11 * , *; | [A]JP2014025927 (LSIS CO LTD) [A] 1-11; | [A]JP2018046609 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-11* , *; | [A]JP2018102082 (FANUC LTD) [A] 1-11 | by applicant | JP2007295655 | JP2009168587 |