Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.07.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
14.07.2023 | Change - classification | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
14.07.2023 | Change - classification | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
13.01.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
09.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
19.08.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
25.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.06.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.06.2022 | Change - representative | |
10.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.05.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |