Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021092672 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CA51612 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023227547 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CA51612 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3154150 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CA51612 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4058486 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2023 | A4 | EP4058486 | 21.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CA51612 | 12.11.2019 |