Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.06.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
24.02.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
24.02.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
27.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
12.08.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
06.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.06.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.06.2022 | Change - representative | |
10.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |