EP4055267 - TAPPET ROLLER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins, Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | For all designated states Unal, Mustafa Utku Bodastigen 9 151 68 Sodertalje / SE | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESIN, Aleksandr E. 2422 Cedar Crest Drive Columbus, Indiana 47203 / US | 02 /
WANG, Chin-Pei 3753 Marcella Row Greenwood, Indiana 46143 / US | 03 /
JEFFRIES, Neil 7332 Woodington Place Indianapolis, Indiana 46259 / US | 04 /
GARCIA, Jason R. 10 Carrollwood Court Franklin, Indiana 46131 / US | 05 /
EDWARDS, Romaine O. 90 Dresden Drive Apt. 13B Greenwood, Indiana 46143 / US | 06 /
UNAL, Mustafa Utku Bodastigen 9 151 68 Sodertalje / SE | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 19956998.9 | 19.12.2019 | [2022/37] | WO2019US67501 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021126210 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055267 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/0426, F04B53/18, F02M59/10, F02M63/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
F02M59/102 (EP,US);
F02M63/0001 (EP);
F04B1/0426 (EP);
F04B53/18 (EP);
F16H53/06 (US);
F16H57/042 (US);
F16H57/0467 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | F02M59/00, F02M59/10, F01L1/14, F01L1/053 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | STÖSSEL-ROLLENANORDNUNG | [2022/37] | English: | TAPPET ROLLER ASSEMBLY | [2022/37] | French: | ENSEMBLE ROULEAU POUSSOIR | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 11.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001221131 (BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 1* paragraphs [0014] - [0018]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]US2006222517 (BREUER GERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 4-6 * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]WO2012080330 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 19 - page 10, line 37; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2012156136 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,11,12 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 30; figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]US2016222934 (OKI NAOTO [JP]) [X] 1,13,15-18 * paragraphs [0057] - [0063]; figures 5,6a-6d * [Y] 2-12 [I] 14; | [Y]WO2017072006 (DELPHI INT OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG SARL [LU]) [Y] 9 * page 6, line 12 - page 9, line 17; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2018274647 (HAUVESPRE BENOÎT [FR], et al) [Y] 8,10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0057]; figures 2-5 * | International search | [A]DE102012223413 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-17 * ; Figure 4 [MACHINE TRANSLATED] *; | [A]US2015096537 (GRAHAM MARK S [GB]) [A] 1-17 * ; Figure 4; Paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US9200626 (PARK YONGSOON [KR]) [A] 1-17 * ; Figure 5 *; | [A]WO2016105355 (CUMMINS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * ; Figure 2 *; | [A]WO2018153396 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-17* ; Figure 1 [MACHINE TRANSLATED] * |