31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.03.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
02.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
29.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.05.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.04.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.02.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.02.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
05.02.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
21.08.2020 |
Change - representative |
|