EP3787045 - MARKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZUR SPACE Solar Power GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köstler, Wolfgang Badener Str. 185 74074 Heilbronn / DE | 02 /
Sommer, Steffen Lindenstraße 91 71732 Tamm / DE | 03 /
Frey, Alexander Stockportstraße 12 74081 Heilbronn / DE | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20000295.4 | 18.08.2020 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | DE20191006090 | 29.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019006090 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787045 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3787045 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0687, H01L31/0224, H01L31/18, H01L23/544 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H01L31/0687 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/18 (EP,CN);
H01L31/1876 (US);
H01L23/544 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/02167 (US);
H01L31/02245 (EP);
H01L31/0725 (CN);
H01L31/186 (US);
H01L2223/54406 (CN);
H01L2223/54413 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/0336 (US);
H01L31/078 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MARKIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/09] | English: | MARKING METHOD | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MARQUAGE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 28.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2020 | AL | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 18.08.2020 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.08.2020 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | ES | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 04.08.2021 | |
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102009009499 (DEUTSCHE CELL GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]TW201120594 (GALLANT PREC MACHINING CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2016064334 (BISHOP CRAIG [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2019181289 (DERKACS DANIEL [US], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A] - PILAR SWART ET AL, "Assessment of the overall resource consumption of germanium wafer production for high concentration photovoltaics", RESOURCES, CONSERVATION AND RECYCLING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 55, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.RESCONREC.2011.06.016, ISSN 0921-3449, (20110629), pages 1119 - 1128, (20110705), XP028300260 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.resconrec.2011.06.016 | [A] - YANG HONGXING ET AL, "Research on laser marking technology of Ge wafers", BANDAOTI JISHU - SEMICONDUCTOR TECHNOLOGY, GAI-KAN BIANJIBU, SHIJIAZHUANG, CN, (20090630), vol. 34, no. 7, ISSN 1003-353X, pages 676 - 678, XP009524868 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - M Niemeyer ET AL, "NEXT GENERATION OF WAFER-BONDED MULTI-JUNCTION SOLAR CELLS", Proceedings of the 29th European Photovoltaic Solar Energy Conference and Exhibition, Sylvensteinstr. 2 81369 Munich, Germany, doi:10.4229/EUPVSEC20142014-4BO.10.2, ISBN 978-3-936338-34-8, (2014), pages 1991 - 1995, URL: https://www.eupvsec-proceedings.com/proceedings?paper=26967, (20160913), XP055302046 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4229/EUPVSEC20142014-4BO.10.2 | by applicant | US2009050198 | DE102009009499 | US2016064334 | US2016172306 | US2019181289 |