EP3686789 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RESPONDING TO A BUILDING EVENT, AND MEMORIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHA, Danqing Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai / CN | 02 /
JIA, Zhen Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Guichun Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Zhengang Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai / CN | 05 /
WAGNER, Timothy C. 411 Silver Lane East Hartford, CT 06108 / US | 06 /
BIRNKRANT, Michael J. 411 Silver Lane East Hartford, CT 06108 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 20153221.5 | 22.01.2020 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | CN20191080977 | 28.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910080977 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686789 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
G08B19/00 (CN);
G06F18/24323 (EP);
G06N5/01 (US);
G06Q10/06315 (US);
G06Q50/163 (US);
G06Q50/265 (US);
G06Q90/205 (US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G08B21/10 (CN);
G08B21/14 (CN);
G08B25/08 (CN);
G06V20/44 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM REAGIEREN AUF EIN GEBÄUDEEREIGNIS UND SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/31] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RESPONDING TO A BUILDING EVENT, AND MEMORIZER | [2020/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR RÉPONDRE À UN ÉVÉNEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION ET MÉMORISATEUR | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 28.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN107978119 (UNIV WUHAN SCIENCE & TECH)[A] 1; | [A]US2018260630 (CAO SONG [US], et al) [A] 1; | [X] - ANDREA CAVALLARO ED - GEORGE BEBIS ET AL, Event Detection in Underground Stations Using Multiple Heterogeneous Surveillance Cameras, ADVANCES IN VISUAL COMPUTING LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 535 - 542, (20050101), ISBN 978-3-540-30750-1, XP019025338 [X] 1-15 * abstract, §2, §1, first sentence;; figure 5; table 1 * |