Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.02.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
24.10.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.06.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.06.2022 | First examination report | |
29.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.03.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.07.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
21.04.2020 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | |
21.04.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.04.2020 | Change - representative | |
01.04.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |