Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023422145 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514877538 | 07.10.2015 | US201113075961 | 30.03.2011 | US201715722720 | 02.10.2017 | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | US201916572276 | 16.09.2019 | US202117360668 | 28.06.2021 | US202318466133 | 13.09.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9781654 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2016029289 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514877538 | 07.10.2015 | US201113075961 | 30.03.2011 | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011261747 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113075961 | 30.03.2011 | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11765641 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | B2 | US2021329530 | 21.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514877538 | 07.10.2015 | US201113075961 | 30.03.2011 | US201715722720 | 02.10.2017 | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | US201916572276 | 16.09.2019 | US202117360668 | 28.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11076340 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2021 | B2 | US2020015145 | 09.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514877538 | 07.10.2015 | US201113075961 | 30.03.2011 | US201715722720 | 02.10.2017 | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | US201916572276 | 16.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10420010 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2019 | B2 | US2018027474 | 25.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514877538 | 07.10.2015 | US201113075961 | 30.03.2011 | US201715722720 | 02.10.2017 | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101878000B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2018 | B1 | KR20130025392 | 11.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | WO2011US30551 | 30.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023133611 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | JP2019168305 | 17.09.2019 | JP2021156645 | 27.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022002405 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | JP2019168305 | 17.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013524643 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | WO2011US30551 | 30.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2553963 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2020 | B1 | EP2553963 | 06.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | WO2011US30551 | 30.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107580330B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2021 | B | CN107580330 | 12.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | CN201180017802 | 30.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103098507B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2017 | B | CN103098507 | 08.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | WO2011US30551 | 30.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3694247 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | WO2011US30551 | 30.03.2011 | EP11713596 | 30.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011123549 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7199327B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2023 | B2 | JP2019208289 | 05.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016007077 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5824132B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B2 | JP2015046932 | 12.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI543650B | 21.07.2016 | B | TW201204138 | 16.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32053510 | 02.04.2010 | US37355510 | 13.08.2010 | US32064410 | 02.04.2010 | Type | Earlier application | EP2553963 |