EP3694247 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING COMMUNICATION VIA A RELAY NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/11] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Peter S. 412 Pond Path E. Setauket, NY 11733 / US | 02 /
Stern- Berkowitz, Janet A. 41-20 Glenwood Street Little Neck, NY 11363 / US | 03 /
TAMAKI, Nobuyuki 2 Huntington Quadrangle, 4th floor Melville, New York 11747 / US | 04 /
Terry, Stephen, E. 15 Summit Avenue Northport, NY 11768 / US | 05 /
Beluri, Mihaela C. 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | 06 /
LIU, Kai 4727 Vista Ridge Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20165298.9 | 30.03.2011 | [2020/33] | Priority number, date | US201032053510P | 02.04.2010 Original published format: US 32053510 P | US201032064410P | 02.04.2010 Original published format: US 32064410 P | US201037355510P | 13.08.2010 Original published format: US 37355510 P | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694247 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/26, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
H04B7/155 (EP,US);
H04W16/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04W40/22 (US);
H04W28/0278 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/12 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMMUNIKATIONSUNTERSTÜTZUNG ÜBER EINEN RELAISKNOTEN | [2020/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING COMMUNICATION VIA A RELAY NODE | [2020/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SUPPORT DE COMMUNICATION VIA UN N UD DE RELAIS | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11713596.2 / EP2553963 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1296475 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [YA]WO2009088937 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al); | [YA]US2009191882 (KOVACS ISTVAN Z [DK], et al); | [YA]WO2009095814 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2010135995 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) | by applicant | US19440613206 | US19350613205 | US19550613735 |