17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
29.12.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
20.01.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
13.01.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.11.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
29.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
29.10.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.10.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
07.09.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.06.2020 |
Change - representative |
|