Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3916450 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2023 | B1 | EP3916450 | 01.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20177461 | 29.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3916450T | 13.03.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20177461 | 29.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2940067T | 03.05.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20177461 | 29.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3916450T | 15.05.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20177461 | 29.05.2020 |