EP3916450 - SPLICE MODULE WITH GUIDE FOR PATCH CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauff-Technik GRIDCOM GmbH Geiselroter Heidle 1 73494 Rosenberg / DE | [2022/29] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states ZweiCom-Hauff GmbH Geiselroter Heidle 1 73494 Rosenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GSCHWINDER, Roland 73431 Aalen / DE | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB München Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [2023/08] |
Former [2021/48] | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Machtlfinger Strasse 9 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20177461.9 | 29.05.2020 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916450 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3916450 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/4454 (EP);
G02B6/44524 (EP);
G02B6/4478 (EP);
G02B6/4452 (EP);
G02B6/4455 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPLEISSMODUL MIT FÜHRUNG FÜR PATCHKABEL | [2021/48] | English: | SPLICE MODULE WITH GUIDE FOR PATCH CABLE | [2021/48] | French: | MODULE D'ÉPISSURE POURVU DE GUIDAGE POUR CORDONS DE BRASSAGE | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 03.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | LU | 29.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/11] | EE | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | EE | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.02.2023 | |
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0657757 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [XI]US5511144 (HAWKINS PAUL D [US], et al); | [A]US5731546 (MILES SCOTT B [US], et al); | [A]US6678455 (KNIGHT PAUL A [US]); | [A]US2013214662 (PIMENTEL NELSON GONCALVES [DE], et al); | [A]US2017227728 (CLAESSENS BART MATTIE [BE], et al); | [A]US2019250350 (BURKETT ALAN DUNCAN [US], et al); | [XI]WO2020061144 (COMMSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) | by applicant | EP2221650 | EP3511753 | EP3528023 |