05.07.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
28.07.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
25.07.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
29.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.12.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 |
Change - English title |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
30.11.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.06.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
12.11.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
10.06.2020 |
Change - representative |
|