EP3922621 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PROPYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/50] | PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING PROPYLENE | ||
[2023/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/50] | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haidegger, Ernst 85521 Riemerling / DE | 02 /
Meiswinkel, Andreas 83253 Rimsting / DE | 03 /
Zander, Hans-Jörg 81479 München / DE | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Reuß, Stephanie Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/50] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20179366.8 | 10.06.2020 | [2021/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922621 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3922621 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/04, C07C1/24, C07C11/04, C07C11/06, C07C29/141, C07C31/10, C07C45/50, C07C47/02, C07C4/02 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C07C11/04 (EP);
C07C1/24 (EP,US);
C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C29/141 (EP);
C07C31/10 (EP);
C07C4/02 (EP);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
C07C47/02 (EP);
Y02P20/141 (EP);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/24, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C29/141, C07C31/10 (EP);
C07C4/02, C07C11/04 (EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROZESS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROPYLEN | [2023/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PROPYLENE | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PROPYLÈNE | [2023/01] |
Former [2021/50] | PROZESS UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROPYLEN | ||
Former [2021/50] | PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING PROPYLENE | ||
Former [2021/50] | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION DE PROPYLÈNES | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 15.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BRPI0604284 (BRASKEM SA [BR]) [A] 1-18 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US10519087 (CORTHALS STEVEN L F [BE], et al) [AD] 1-18* figure 1; claim 1 * | Examination | US9856198 | by applicant | US10519087 |