Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
10.04.2023 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
01.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.04.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
02.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.02.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
28.01.2022 | First examination report | |
03.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.01.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.01.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
11.12.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
22.06.2020 | Change - representative |