EP3764229 - INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Masanori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20181378.9 | 22.06.2020 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | JP20190126692 | 08.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019126692 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764229 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G06F9/5088 (EP,CN);
G06F9/505 (CN,US);
G06F9/4856 (US);
G06F9/45558 (CN);
G06F9/4881 (US);
H04L43/0852 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/02] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2021/02] | French: | PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/28] | 25.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014173623 (CHANG SHU-HSIN [TW], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0039] * * claim 1 ** figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [I]US2018157527 (TUNG YI-SHIN [TW], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2007226587 | JP2009237935 | JP2013250905 |