Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11413065 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2022 | B2 | US2020405349 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916455838 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7527842B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2024 | B2 | JP2021007737 | 28.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916455838 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112137692 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916455838 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3079787 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916455838 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020203125 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916455838 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3756594 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2022 | B1 | EP3756594 | 30.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916455838 | 28.06.2019 |