EP3770894 - AN OLED DISPLAY CONFIGURATION AND METHOD OF DRIVING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/31] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubey, Arvind c/o Continental Automotive Singapore Pte. Ltd. Intellectual Property 80, Boon Keng Road, Continental Building Singapore 339780 / SG | 02 /
Jung, Samuel c/o Continental Automotive Singapore Pte. Ltd. Intellectual Property 80, Boon Keng Road, Continental Building Singapore 339780 / SG | 03 /
Lee, Fook Wai c/o Continental Automotive Singapore Pte. Ltd. Intellectual Property 80, Boon Keng Road, Continental Building Singapore 339780 / SG | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Lee, Jun-Hoe Daniel Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 20187164.7 | 22.07.2020 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | GB20190010485 | 23.07.2019 Original published format: GB 201910485 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770894 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3225, G09G3/20, H01L27/32 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
G09G3/3225 (EP,GB);
G09G3/2003 (EP);
G09G3/2074 (EP);
H10K59/10 (EP,GB);
H10K59/35 (EP);
G09G2300/023 (EP);
G09G2300/0426 (EP);
G09G2310/0235 (EP);
G09G2320/0242 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OLED-ANZEIGEKONFIGURATION UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN ANSTEUERUNG | [2021/04] | English: | AN OLED DISPLAY CONFIGURATION AND METHOD OF DRIVING THEREOF | [2021/04] | French: | CONFIGURATION D'AFFICHAGE DELO ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2400979 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS CO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract ** paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-25 * |