EP3777890 - STEM CELLS CONTAINING STATIN-ENCAPSULATED NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states II, Masaaki 3-5-202, 1-chome Sawaraginishi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 5690868 / JP | For all designated states Foundation for Biomedical Research and Innovation at Kobe 6-3-7, Minatojima Minamimachi Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-0047 / JP | [2021/25] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states II, Masaaki 3-5-202, 1-chome Sawaraginishi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 5690868 / JP | ||
For all designated states Foundation for Biomedical Research and Innovation at Kobe 2-2, Minatojima Minamimachi Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-0047 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
II, Masaaki 3-5-202, 1-chome, Sawaraginishi, Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 5690868 / JP | 02 /
TABATA, Yasuhiko Institue for Frontier Medical Sciences Kyoto University 53 Shogoin Kawahara-cho, Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 6068507 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20187452.6 | 06.11.2015 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | JP20140228409 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014228409 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777890 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K9/16, A61K9/51, A61K31/366, A61K35/12, A61K47/34, A61P9/10, A61P43/00, A61K35/26 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A61K35/26 (EP);
A61K9/5146 (KR);
A61K9/51 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
A61K35/28 (KR);
A61K35/34 (EP,US);
A61K45/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K47/6931 (US);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61K9/141 (US);
A61K9/16 (EP,US);
A61K9/1641 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N5/0667 (KR);
A61K2039/55555 (US);
C12N2501/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STAMMZELLEN MIT STATINEINGEKAPSELTEN NANOPARTIKELN | [2021/07] | English: | STEM CELLS CONTAINING STATIN-ENCAPSULATED NANOPARTICLES | [2021/07] | French: | CELLULES SOUCHES CONTENANT DES NANOPARTICULES DE STATINE ENCAPSULÉE | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 02.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15892064.5 / EP3231443 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006182724 (RIORDAN NEIL H [US]); | [Y]US2010086615 (EGASHIRA KENSUKE [JP], et al); | by applicant | JP2012021002 |