Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
05.11.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.10.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
06.11.2020 | Change - representative | |
08.09.2020 | Change - representative |