Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023324125 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP70894 | 26.07.2021 | EP20194754 | 07.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023540695 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP70894 | 26.07.2021 | EP20194754 | 07.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4211414 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | B1 | EP4211414 | 19.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP70894 | 26.07.2021 | EP20194754 | 07.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116134284 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP70894 | 26.07.2021 | EP20194754 | 07.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022048824 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20194754 | 07.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3964784 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20194754 | 07.09.2020 |