Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
05.11.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.10.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.02.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
18.09.2020 | Change - representative |