EP3971993 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR BACK STRUCTURE OF DOUBLE-SIDED P-TYPE SOLLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jbao Technology Ltd. 13F-2, No.100, Sec.1, Jiafeng 11th Rd. Zhubei City Hsinchu County 30273 / TW | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shan, Ling-Pao 30273 Hsinchu County / TW | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20196539.9 | 16.09.2020 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971993 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER RÜCKSEITENSTRUKTUR EINER DOPPELSEITIGEN SOLARZELLE DES TYPS P | [2022/12] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR BACK STRUCTURE OF DOUBLE-SIDED P-TYPE SOLLAR CELL | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LA STRUCTURE DORSALE D'UNE CELLULE SOLAIRE DOUBLE FACE DE TYPE P | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010193367 (LUCH DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0183]; figures 15,18 *; | [A]US2011265870 (PARK CHANGSEO [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014332072 (BEAUCARNE GUY DAMIEN SERGE [BE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2898545 (IMEC VZW [BE]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]KR101597532B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US2016104810 (ADACHI DAISUKE [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]KR101889776B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |