EP3798680 - CALIBRATED PHOTO-DETECTING APPARATUS AND CALIBRATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artilux Inc. 101 Jefferson Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Pai-Chuan 8F.-1, NO.6, TAIYUAN 1ST ST., ZHUBEI CITY 302 HSINCHU COUNTY / TW | 02 /
Huang, Pai-Ting 8F.-1, NO.6, TAIYUAN 1ST ST., ZHUBEI CITY 302 HSINCHU COUNTY / TW | 03 /
Chu, Feng-Cheng 8F.-1, NO.6, TAIYUAN 1ST ST., ZHUBEI CITY 302 HSINCHU COUNTY / TW | 04 /
Na, Yun-Chung 8F.-1, NO.6, TAIYUAN 1ST ST., ZHUBEI CITY 302 HSINCHU COUNTY / TW | 05 /
Chen, Chien-Lung 8F.-1, NO.6, TAIYUAN 1ST ST., ZHUBEI CITY 302 HSINCHU COUNTY / TW | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Yang, Shu Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | Yang, Shu Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20198189.1 | 24.09.2020 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | US201962906112P | 26.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962906112 P | US201962930582P | 05.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962930582 P | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798680 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/894, G01S7/497, G01S7/4865 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G01S17/894 (EP);
H04N13/246 (CN,US);
G01S7/4866 (EP);
G01S7/497 (EP);
G06T19/20 (CN);
H04N13/243 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALIBRIERTE PHOTODETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KALIBRIERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/13] | English: | CALIBRATED PHOTO-DETECTING APPARATUS AND CALIBRATION METHOD THEREOF | [2021/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE PHOTO-DÉTECTION ÉTALONNÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 24.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012176476 (SCHMIDT MIRKO [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,11,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0061] - [0078] - [0144] - [0150] *; | [X]US2015302570 (SHIRAKYAN GRIGOR [US], et al) [X] 1,11,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0027] - [0030] *; | [XI]US2018302611 (BAAK JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0013] , [0022] - [0027] - [0044] - [0051] - [0069]; claims 15,18 * [I] 2,6-9,12,15; | [X]US2018313955 (XU ZHANPING [US]) [X] 1,5,11,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0028] - [0031] * |