EP3806518 - HYBRID INTRUSION DETECTION MODEL FOR CYBER-ATTACKS IN AVIONICS INTERNET GATEWAYS USING EDGE ANALYTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANAKIRAMAN, Kirupakar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 02 /
SRINIVASAN, Narayanan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 03 /
RAO, Nayyar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 04 /
MOHAN, Rajeev HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 05 /
JAYATHIRTHA, Srihari HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20200650.8 | 07.10.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | IN201941040973 | 10.10.2019 Original published format: IN201941040973 | US202017037186 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: US202017037186 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806518 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/60, H04L29/06 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H04W12/60 (EP);
H04L63/1416 (EP);
H04L63/145 (EP);
H04L63/1466 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDES EINDRINGDETEKTIONSMODELL FÜR CYBER-ANGRIFFE IN AVIONIK-INTERNET-GATEWAYS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON RANDANALYTIK | [2021/15] | English: | HYBRID INTRUSION DETECTION MODEL FOR CYBER-ATTACKS IN AVIONICS INTERNET GATEWAYS USING EDGE ANALYTICS | [2021/15] | French: | MODÈLE DE DÉTECTION D'INTRUSION HYBRIDE POUR LES CYBER-ATTAQUES DANS LES PASSERELLES INTERNET D'AVIONIQUE À L'AIDE D'ANALYSE PÉRIPHÉRIQUE | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8903593 (ADDEPALLI SATEESH K [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [I] - SEDJELMACI HICHEM ET AL, "A lightweight anomaly detection technique for low-resource IoT devices: A game-theoretic methodology", 2016 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), IEEE, (20160522), doi:10.1109/ICC.2016.7510811, pages 1 - 6, XP032921986 [I] 1-15 * sections I, II, III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2016.7510811 | [A] - THANH THI NGUYEN ET AL, "Deep Reinforcement Learning for Cyber Security", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190613), XP081381258 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - SPARSH SHARMA ET AL, "A survey on Intrusion Detection Systems and Honeypot based proactive security mechanisms in VANETs and VANET Cloud", VEHICULAR COMMUNICATIONS, (20180401), vol. 12, doi:10.1016/j.vehcom.2018.04.005, ISSN 2214-2096, pages 138 - 164, XP055536087 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vehcom.2018.04.005 | [A] - MAHDI DIBAEI ET AL, "An Overview of Attacks and Defences on Intelligent Connected Vehicles", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190717), XP081443074 [A] 1-15 * abstract * |