Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.09.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
26.07.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
17.03.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.03.2023 | First examination report | |
21.10.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
12.11.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
12.11.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
09.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.04.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
20.10.2020 | Change - representative |