EP3816404 - SEAL ASSEMBLY FOR USE IN GAS TURBINE ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUAIB, Nasr A. 50 Winter St. Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 02 /
ZIMMITTI, Jonathan F. 72 Line Street Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 03 /
SONOKAWA, Masayoshi 75 Whitehill Drive West Hartford, CT 06117 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 20202836.1 | 20.10.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | US201916666890 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: US201916666890 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816404 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
F01D11/003 (EP,US);
F01D25/183 (US);
F02C7/06 (US);
F02C7/28 (US);
F04D29/102 (US);
F16J15/3464 (EP);
F16J15/348 (EP);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2240/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN GASTURBINENMOTOREN | [2021/18] | English: | SEAL ASSEMBLY FOR USE IN GAS TURBINE ENGINES | [2021/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ À UTILISER DANS LES MOTEURS DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3784213 (VOITIK R); | [XY]US2010283209 (VANDERZYDEN HENRY R [US]); | [Y]US9109515 (HAYNES GEORGE P [US]); | [Y]EP3447251 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) |