EP3789172 - PLASTICATING SCREW HAVING GROOVES OF VARYING ANGLES AND DEPTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davis-Standard, LLC One Extrusion Drive Pawcatuck CT 06379 / US | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christiano, John P. 7-1 Matson Ridge Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 20204529.0 | 05.04.2017 | [2021/10] | Priority number, date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: US201615091802 | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3789172 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3789172 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/42, B29C48/535, B29C48/56, B29C48/60, B29C48/605, B29C48/615, // B29C48/03, B29C48/395, B29C48/64, B29C48/65, B29C48/67 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
B29B7/429 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/535 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/53 (CN,US);
B29B7/826 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/397 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/505 (CN);
B29C48/54 (KR);
B29C48/56 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C48/59 (KR);
B29C48/60 (EP,US);
B29C48/605 (EP,US);
B29C48/615 (EP,US);
B29C48/655 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/67 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] |
Former [2021/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PLASTIFIZIERUNGSSCHNECKE MIT RILLEN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN WINKELN UND TIEFEN | [2021/10] | English: | PLASTICATING SCREW HAVING GROOVES OF VARYING ANGLES AND DEPTHS | [2021/10] | French: | VIS DE PLASTIFICATION POURVUE DE RAINURES AYANT DES PROFONDEURS ET DES ANGLES VARIABLES | [2021/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 02.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17165071.6 / EP3228435 | EP19196515.1 / EP3597386 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2483319 (EL PASO POLYOLEFINS [US]) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [A]US4639143 (FRANKLAND JR JAMES D [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5816698 (DURINA MICHAEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, lines 6-11 * * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 29 * * abstract *; | [A]US6488399 (WOMER TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, lines 6-10 * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 67 * * abstract *; | [A]US6497508 (WOMER TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, lines 6-12 * * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 8 * * abstract *; | [A]US2007104022 (KUHMAN JON L [US]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0020] * * abstract * | by applicant | US6488399 |